+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor