+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Martinez, Tadlock, West (Kevin), Meredith, Roberts (Sean)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Humphrey
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 27, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2