+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Newhouse, Dahm, Montgomery, Howard, Floyd, Young
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Efficiency
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dills
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 22, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1
May 20, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 17
March 28, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11