+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor