+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- Remove Representative Taylor as principal House author and substitute with Representative Vancuren
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Commerce
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Taylor
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16