+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walker
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor