+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Published on Consent Docket
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Virgin
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor