+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed in Committee - Finance
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Amended
- General Order
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Sears, Shannon
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dank
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18