+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Murphey
- General Order
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hall
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12
February 21, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7