+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Referred for engrossment
- Enacting clause restored
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Silk
- Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
- Enacting clause stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
- Emergency clause stricken
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, McDugle
- General Order
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Frix
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Bush
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 22, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 2
April 16, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1