+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
- CCR adopted
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Coleman, Leewright, Pugh, Bergstrom, Brooks, Young
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McEntire
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 16, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
May 15, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 15
April 25, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16