+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Sharp
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Meredith
- Coauthored by Tadlock
- Coauthored by Loring
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Montgomery, Nollan
- General Order
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hoskin
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 7
February 22, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor