+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- General Order
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Coody (Ann)
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 19, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11