+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CCR submitted
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Stanislawski, Bice, Pugh, Brooks, Young
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Commerce
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McEntire
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 10
April 25, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor