+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14; Ayes: 72 Nays: 12
- SA's read, adopted
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
- Emergency added
- Emergency clause stricken
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 5
May 9, 2017: House Emergency
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 14
April 26, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4
March 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 13
February 15, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor