+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sherrer
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15