+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cox
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sherrer
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 18
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16