+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 5
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Miller
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4