+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency
- Withdrawn from Administrative Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Miller
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8