+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in GCCA
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Enacting clause stricken
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Emergency clause stricken
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Ford
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Casey, Perryman, Sherrer, Cockroft, Hoskin
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Cannaday
- Remove Representative Casey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cannaday
- General Order
- House Rule suspended
- Amended by floor substitute
- Title restored
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 15
- Referred for engrossment
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Casey
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2015: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor