+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wallace
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor