+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7
- Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh)
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Lawson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor