+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Floyd
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Derby
- First Reading
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walker
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 17, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 3