+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 9
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson, Jackson
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Moore
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3