+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Finance Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Ayes: 63 Nays: 11
- Title stricken
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Fincher
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McBride
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2019: House Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 27
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
February 12, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor