+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 03/11/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Coauthored by all other Representatives
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Fugate
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 6
March 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (101)
Type:
Primary Sponsor