+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2018
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Lepak
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor