+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Martin (Steve)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 10
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor