+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14
- General Order
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Condit
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 9
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7