+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (82)
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/25/2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- CCR adopted
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
- CCR considered
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
- Laid over
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Hardin (David), Grego
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
- To Senate
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
- Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Hamilton
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Ford, Wolfley, Baker, Roberts (Eric), McDugle, Stark, Stearman, Miller, Conley, Townley, Davis, Dempsey, Dills, Moore, Roe, Olsen, Frix, West (Tammy), Luttrell, CrosswhiteHader, Dobrinski, Bashore, West (Kevin), Manger, Steagall, Caldwell (Trey), Hardin (David), Grego, Sims, Sterling, Kendrix, Kerbs, Marti
- CCR submitted
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Treat, David, Thompson, Hall, Daniels, Floyd, Kirt
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on States Rights
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) ODonnell
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Title restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
- Remove as coauthor Senator Merrick
- Coauthored by Senator Howard
- Coauthored by Senator Jech
- Remove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom
- Coauthored by Senator Allen
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Humphrey
- Remove as coauthor Senator Burns
- Remove as coauthor Senator Dahm
- Remove as coauthor Senator Jett
- Coauthored by Senator Thompson
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Jett
- Coauthored by Senator Rogers
- Coauthored by Senator Burns
- Coauthored by Senator Merrick
- Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
- Coauthored by Senator Standridge
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Coauthored by Senator Quinn
- Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Coauthored by Senator Haste
- Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Treat
- Coauthored by Senator Daniels
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Coauthored by Senator Weaver
- Coauthored by Senator David
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer
- Coauthored by Senator Montgomery
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Representative McBride
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Hamilton
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Culver, Smith, Echols, Roberts (Sean)
- Amended
- Emergency added
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18
- Referred for engrossment
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Sims, Luttrell, Russ, Manger, Worthen, Lepak, Roberts (Eric), Gann, Sterling, Roe, Kendrix, Hilbert, Davis, West (Josh), Bashore, West (Kevin), Cornwell, Lowe (Dick), Moore, West (Rick), Grego, May, Townley, Stearman, Olsen, Wolfley, Stark, Dobrinski, Patzkowsky, Talley, Newton, Williams, Miller, West (Tammy), Lawson, Mize, Hill, Hardin (David), Steagall, Fetgatter, Vancuren, Boatman, Hasenbeck, Martinez, Dempsey, Phillips, McEntire, Kerbs, Boles, Dills, Hardin (Tommy), Sneed, Johns, Osburn, Marti, Frix, CrosswhiteHader, Baker, Conley, ODonnell, Strom, Humphrey, Caldwell (Trey), Caldwell (Chad), Burns, Ford, McDugle, Wallace
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States Rights Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to States Rights
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2021: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
May 18, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 6
April 20, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor