+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osburn (Mike)
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor