+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Bice
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Haste
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McCall
- Coauthored by Hicks
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright, West (Josh), Boles, Townley, Lawson
- General Order
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sanders
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor