+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Newton
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
February 14, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11