+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion expired
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDaniel (Jeannie)
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 56
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McDaniel (Jeannie)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2015: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 13
March 9, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor