+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
- Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Bennett
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16