+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Banking and Financial Services Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Banking and Financial Services
- Withdrawn from Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Russ
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor