+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Rousselot
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor