+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0; Ayes: 73 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
- To Senate
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Standridge, Griffin, David, Treat, Paddack, Floyd
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth, and Family Services
- SA's adoption rescinded
- Fourth Reading and signing rescinded
- Recalled from enrollment
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 4
- SA's read, adopted
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- Remove Representative Joyner as principal House author and substitute with Representative Peterson
- Referred for engrossment
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Joyner
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 24
March 3, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor