+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
- First Reading
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
- General Order
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Garrison (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Rousselot
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
February 11, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 5, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16