+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Weaver
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 10
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor