+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6
- CCR adopted
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named David, Crain, Griffin, Treat, Burrage, Ivester
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Health
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Coody
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 8
May 20, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
April 17, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 6
March 6, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor