+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14
- General Order, Considered
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bell
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
- General Order
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dempsey
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Common Education
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Vancuren
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 16, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12