+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted, GCCA
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: GCCA
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sears
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
May 23, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 13
April 18, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
February 18, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor