+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Jett
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10
- General Order, Considered
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Steagall
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 18
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Dobrinski, Patzkowsky, West (Tammy), Manger, Roberts (Sean), Lepak, Dills
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Allen
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Hardin (David), Boles, Conley, Smith, West (Kevin), Humphrey, Russ, Stark, CrosswhiteHader, McDugle, Grego, Wolfley, Kendrix, Mize, ODonnell, Lawson, Stearman
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Olsen
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor