+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart, Sherrer
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Shoemake
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Absent: 21
April 17, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 17
February 19, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13