+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 14
- SA's read, adopted
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
- General Order, Amended
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 20
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osburn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 7
April 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 7
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11