+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osburn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor