+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Vaughan
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
- Considered
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
- Referred for engrossment
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Laid over
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ownbey
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2013: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 82
- Absent: 19
March 5, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13