+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sanders
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 8
February 14, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 20
February 7, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor