+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 16
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Hill
- General Order
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pae
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 7
February 28, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor